USA v. Stoltenberg et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00109-60793 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
60
01/25/2019
Order
61
01/28/2019
1 - Ex Parte (NON-CJA) Sealed Motion
62
01/28/2019
Affidavit
01/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
02/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
02/14/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
03/10/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
71
03/10/2019
Affidavit
03/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
03/14/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
75
03/14/2019
Affidavit
03/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
03/14/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
03/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
03/20/2019
Bail Review Hearing
82
03/20/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
83
03/20/2019
Order of Release
04/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
04/14/2019
Status Report
04/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
04/16/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
89
04/17/2019
Compel
90
04/17/2019
Memorandum
91
04/17/2019
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
04/17/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
04/25/2019
Order on Motion to Compel
96
04/26/2019
Status Report
97
04/29/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
04/30/2019
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
05/06/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
101
05/09/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
05/13/2019
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
102
05/14/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
05/14/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/14/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
104
05/14/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
05/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
05/16/2019
Response in Opposition
05/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2019
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
109
05/17/2019
Order
110
05/21/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
111
05/21/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
05/21/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
05/22/2019
Response in Opposition

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.