USA v. Stoltenberg et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00109-60794 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/21/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
09/21/2018
Indictment - For Public
09/24/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
09/26/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/26/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/26/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
7
09/26/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
8
09/26/2018
Order of Detention
9
09/26/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
10
09/27/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
09/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
10/02/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/03/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/03/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
17
10/03/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
18
10/03/2018
Order of Detention
19
10/04/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
20
10/09/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
21
10/09/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
22
10/09/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
23
10/24/2018
Continue
24
10/24/2018
Affidavit
10/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
10/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
11/14/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
11/16/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
34
11/17/2018
Bail Review Hearing
36
11/20/2018
Notice (Other)
11/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
11/28/2018
Notice (Other)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
12/14/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
42
12/18/2018
Plea Agreement
43
12/18/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
44
12/26/2018
Notice (Other)
12/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
01/04/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
49
01/04/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
01/04/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
01/08/2019
Forfeiture of Property
53
01/17/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
01/22/2019
Supplement
57
01/24/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
01/24/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
02/26/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
69
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
79
03/18/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/19/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
04/22/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
94
04/22/2019
Transcript
114
05/22/2019
Continue

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.