USA v. Straley
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00559 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/20/2018
Complaint
11/20/2018
Notice of Arrest - PC (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/21/2018
Pretrial Services Report
4
11/23/2018
Notice (Other)
11/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/26/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
8
11/26/2018
Order of Detention
9
11/26/2018
Amended Pretrial Services Report
10
11/27/2018
Detention Hearing
11/28/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/04/2018
Notice (Other)
14
12/04/2018
Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
15
12/07/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
16
12/07/2018
Order of Release
12/10/2018
Clerks Notice - Case Reassigned to KFM (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.