USA v. Suchan
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00055-59951 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
05/21/2018
Errata
14
06/08/2018
Passport Surrendered
15
06/26/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
07/17/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
18
07/17/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
19
07/23/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
07/24/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
07/24/2018
Continue
22
07/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
23
07/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
24
07/24/2018
Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
07/24/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
27
07/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
28
07/25/2018
Notice (Other)
29
07/27/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
30
07/30/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
08/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
07/30/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
32
07/30/2018
Notice (Other)
34
08/01/2018
DEPS Notice
35
08/03/2018
Supplement
36
08/10/2018
Supplement
37
08/15/2018
Continue
08/16/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
08/29/2018
Continue
08/30/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
08/30/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
08/31/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
08/30/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
45
09/04/2018
Status Report
47
09/11/2018
Leave to File Document
48
09/11/2018
Status Report
09/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
09/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
09/23/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
54
09/26/2018
Sentencing
56
09/26/2018
Witness List Public Doc
57
10/10/2018
Judgment
58
10/10/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.