USA v. Suesue et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2007-cr-00035 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
610
05/18/2018
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
611
05/21/2018
Order
612
05/29/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
613
05/30/2018
USCA Case Number
615
06/13/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
06/19/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
618
06/22/2018
Order
619
06/25/2018
USCA Order
620
06/26/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.