USA v. Suesue et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2007-cr-00035-4119 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
607
04/19/2018
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Dennis Suesue re 594 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255; Objections to R&R due to District Judge by 5/3/2018; Reply to Objections to R&R due to District Judge by 5/10/2018. Signed by Judge Kevin F. McCoy on 4/19/18. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
610
05/18/2018
ORDER ADOPTING 607 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Dennis Suesue. Defendant's Amended Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 at Docket 594 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 5/18/2018. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.