USA v. Sullivan
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

3:2015-cr-00010 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
116
05/23/2018
Violation Disposition Report
117
05/26/2018
Memorandum
118
05/26/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
05/31/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
121
06/18/2018
Judgment on Revocation
122
06/18/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.