USA v. Sullivan
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00010-52926 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
116
05/23/2018
Violation Disposition Report
117
05/26/2018
Memorandum
118
05/26/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
05/31/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
121
06/18/2018
Judgment on Revocation
122
06/18/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
12/03/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
12/14/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
131
12/14/2018
Order of Detention
132
12/17/2018
Notice (Other)
133
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
01/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
135
01/14/2019
Notice (Other)
01/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
137
01/21/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
01/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
140
02/05/2019
Violation Disposition Report
141
02/08/2019
Violation Disposition Report
02/11/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
142
02/08/2019
Continue
144
03/07/2019
Continue
03/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
149
04/12/2019
Judgment on Revocation
150
04/12/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.