USA v. Swaney et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2008-cr-00085-8341 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
195
03/04/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
196
03/04/2019
Order of Detention
03/04/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
198
03/11/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
199
03/12/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
200
03/15/2019
Violation Disposition Report
03/18/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/18/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
202
03/22/2019
Judgment on Revocation
203
03/22/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.