USA v. Swenton
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00109 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
62
05/18/2018
Status Report
63
05/21/2018
Dismiss
64
05/22/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss
65
05/22/2018
USCA Mandate
66
05/24/2018
Criminal Judgment of Discharge
67
05/25/2018
Passport Released

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.