USA v. Tauinaola
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00150 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
59
06/08/2018
Witness List
60
06/08/2018
Witness List
06/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
07/10/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum
63
07/11/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum
07/11/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
07/13/2018
DEPS Notice
65
07/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
66
07/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed
67
07/23/2018
Leave to File Document
68
07/23/2018
Dismiss
69
07/26/2018
Memorandum
70
07/30/2018
Response in Opposition
07/31/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
08/03/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/03/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
08/06/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
08/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
08/08/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
77
08/08/2018
Plea Agreement
78
08/10/2018
Continue
79
08/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
80
08/22/2018
Continue
81
08/23/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
08/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
09/25/2018
Continue
09/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.