USA v. Taylor et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00079-49369 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
837
05/21/2018
Response in Opposition
838
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release
839
04/01/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
04/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
841
04/15/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
842
04/16/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.