USA v. Taylor
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00032 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
09/04/2018
Vacate (2255)
40
09/04/2018
Memorandum
41
09/18/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
42
09/18/2018
Order
43
10/16/2018
Appoint Counsel
44
10/16/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
10/31/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
11/01/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
47
11/01/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11/05/2018
Docket Annotation re Supplemental Briefing (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.