USA v. Taylor
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00032-53200 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
09/04/2018
Vacate (2255)
40
09/04/2018
Memorandum
41
09/18/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
42
09/18/2018
Order
43
10/16/2018
Appoint Counsel
44
10/16/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
10/31/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
11/01/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
47
11/01/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11/05/2018
Docket Annotation re Supplemental Briefing (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
01/08/2019
Leave to File Document
49
01/09/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
50
01/09/2019
Notice (Other)
51
01/30/2019
Dismiss
52
01/30/2019
Leave to File Document
53
01/31/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
54
02/01/2019
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
55
02/06/2019
Unopposed Motion
56
02/07/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion
02/07/2019
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
02/20/2019
Response in Opposition
02/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
02/26/2019
Leave to File Document
60
02/27/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
61
02/27/2019
Notice (Other)
62
03/05/2019
Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)
63
03/06/2019
Order
64
03/26/2019
Certificate of Appealability
65
03/27/2019
Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability
66
04/03/2019
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
67
04/05/2019
USCA Case Number

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.