USA v. Teekell
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00141 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
46
06/07/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
47
06/27/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
07/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
07/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
07/13/2018
Continue
07/13/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
07/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
54
07/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
55
07/14/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
56
07/14/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
57
07/19/2018
Forfeiture of Property
58
07/19/2018
Affidavit
07/23/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
07/30/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
62
07/31/2018
Judgment
63
07/31/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
64
07/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/08/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.