USA v. Tejeda et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00066 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
331
05/31/2018
Stipulation
332
06/11/2018
Order on Stipulation
06/12/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
334
06/12/2018
Judgment on Revocation
335
06/12/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
336
06/19/2018
USCA Order
06/22/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
338
06/22/2018
Z-Recommendation for Participation in AK Hope Court
339
07/02/2018
Z-Order for Participation in AK Hope Court
340
07/03/2018
Amended Judgment on Revocation
341
07/03/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
07/06/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
350
09/24/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
09/28/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
352
10/01/2018
Z-Order Terminating Participant from the Alaska Hope Court Program
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.