USA v. Thornhill
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2016-cr-00008 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
96
07/18/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
97
07/21/2018
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
98
07/27/2018
Application for Writ of Execution on Permanent Fund Dividend
07/30/2018
Writ Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
99
08/31/2018
PFD Writ Returned
100
09/01/2018
Transcript
101
09/01/2018
Transcript
102
09/01/2018
Transcript
103
09/01/2018
Transcript
104
09/01/2018
Transcript
105
09/01/2018
Transcript
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.