USA v. Topkok
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00074 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
06/20/2018
Pretrial Services Report
06/26/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
06/28/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
42
06/28/2018
Notice (Other)
43
06/28/2018
Order of Detention
44
06/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Order Setting Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.