USA v. Topkok
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00074-57703 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
06/20/2018
Pretrial Services Report
06/26/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
06/28/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
42
06/28/2018
Notice (Other)
43
06/28/2018
Order of Detention
44
06/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Order Setting Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
09/05/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
10/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
12/14/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
03/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
04/30/2019
Order of Detention
05/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
05/17/2019
Violation Disposition Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.