USA v. Topps
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00158-61106 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/13/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
12/13/2018
Indictment - For Public
12/19/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/19/2018
Pretrial Services Report
6
12/21/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12/21/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/21/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
9
12/21/2018
Order of Detention
10
12/21/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
11
12/27/2018
Amended Pretrial Services Report
12
12/28/2018
Detention Hearing
13
12/28/2018
Order of Detention
14
01/11/2019
Unopposed Motion
15
01/11/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/14/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
01/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/16/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/01/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
03/27/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
04/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
29
04/05/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
04/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
04/08/2019
Plea Agreement
32
04/08/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/10/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/12/2019
Protective Order
35
04/12/2019
Order on Motion for Protective Order
36
04/16/2019
Forfeiture of Property
37
04/17/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.