USA v. Torres - Erik Raul Torres
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

3:2016-cr-00025 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 294 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/23/2016
FELONY INFORMATION as to Erik Raul Torres (1) count(s) 1, 2. Forfeiture Allegations-STRICKEN PER ORDER of 12/20/2016. Modified on 12/20/2016 to add text.
3
02/25/2016
MOTION to Seal the Information by USA as to Erik Raul Torres.
4
02/26/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Jay Allen White. by Erik Raul Torres.
1
Attachments
1 Attachment
5
02/26/2016
NOTICE of Intent to Plead Guilty at Arraignment by Erik Raul Torres.
6
02/29/2016
NOTICE to Retained Criminal Defense Attorney as to Erik Raul Torres
7
03/01/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erik Raul Torres (1). Entered by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/1/2016.
8
03/01/2016
ORDER as to Erik Raul Torres: Consent Plea Hearing set for 3/3/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer. The Clerk is directed to provide a court reporter for this proceeding. If the defendant is in custody, the United States Marshal or the person having custody of the defendant shall produce the defendant for this proceeding. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/1/2016.
9
03/01/2016
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Robert Randolph Neeley appearing for USA.
03/03/2016
Minute Entry for Initial Appearance held before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer as to Erik Raul Torres held on 3/3/2016 (PDF available for court use only). SEE FINAL CONSENT PLEA MINUTES FOR PDF. (Recording Time 9:07-9:10.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
03/03/2016
Consent to Enter Guilty Plea before U. S. Magistrate Judge as to Erik Raul Torres
11
03/03/2016
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Erik Raul Torres
12
03/03/2016
PLEA AGREEMENT ADDENDUM as to Erik Raul Torres
13
03/03/2016
Minute Entry for Consent Plea Hearing held before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer as to Erik Raul Torres on 3/3/2016. GUILTY PLEA entered as to count(s) 1-2. (Court Reporter: Risa Entreking) (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time 9:07-9:51.) Modified on 3/3/2016.
03/03/2016
ORAL ORDER accepting guilty plea and adjudicating defendant as guilty as to Erik Raul Torres. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/3/2016. (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
03/03/2016
ORDER as to Erik Raul Torres: Sentencing set for 7/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/3/2016.
17
04/18/2016
ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion to Seal as to Erik Raul Torres (1). Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/18/2016.
04/18/2016
Case as to Erik Raul Torres Reassigned to Honorable Joel F. Dubina. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case. (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
04/25/2016
DESIGNATION OF UNITED STATES JUDGE FOR SERVICE WITHIN THE CIRCUIT as to Erik Raul Torres by Chief Judge Ed Carnes
21
06/14/2016
ORDER as to Erik Raul Torres, GRANTING 20 MOTION to Continue filed by Erik Raul Torres and 19 MOTION to SEAL filed by Erik Raul Torres. Sentencing set for 7/14/2016 is RESCHEDULED to 8/18/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2F before Honorable Joel F. Dubina. Signed by Honorable Joel F. Dubina on 6/14/2016.
22
07/12/2016
MOTION to Continue by USPO as to Erik Raul Torres.
23
07/12/2016
ORDER as to Erik Raul Torres granting 22 MOTION to Continue sentencing filed by USA. Sentencing set for 8/18/2016 is CONTINUED to 9/20/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Honorable Joel F. Dubina. Signed by Honorable Joel F. Dubina on 7/12/16.
25
08/18/2016
ORDER as to Erik Raul Torres granting 24 MOTION to SEAL filed by USA and resetting Sentencing now set for 9/20/16 to 12/21/2016 10:00 AM before Honorable Joel F. Dubina. Signed by Honorable Joel F. Dubina on 8/18/2016.
28
11/08/2016
ORDER as to Erik Raul Torres that on November 3, 2016, the government filed a motion to continue sentencing (currently set for 12/21/16)and on November 2, 2016, the government filed a motion to seal its motion tocontinue sentencing. Upon consideration of those matters contained in thegovernment's motions and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that saidmotions be and the same are hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Joel F. Dubina on 11/8/2016. (sentencing continued generally)
30
11/29/2016
ORDER granting 29 Motion to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Erik Raul Torres (1) Prior to traveling outside the Middle District of Alabama, however, Torres is ORDERED and DIRECTED to notify pretrial services of his intentions. Signed by Honorable Joel F. Dubina on 11/29/2016.
31
12/01/2016
TEXT ORDER as to Erik Raul Torres AMENDING 30 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release to state that prior to traveling outside the Middle District of Alabama or the Southern District of Florida, Torres is ORDERED and DIRECTED to notify pretrial services of his intentions; All other provisions remain in effect. Entered by Honorable Joel F. Dubina on 12/1/16. (NO PDF ATTACHED).
32
12/19/2016
MOTION to Strike Forfeiture Allegation by USA as to Erik Raul Torres.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
33
12/20/2016
ORDER granting 32 Motion to Strike FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS as to Erik Raul Torres (1). Signed by Honorable Joel F. Dubina on 12/20/16.
37
08/24/2017
MOTION to Travel by Erik Raul Torres.
38
08/30/2017
ORDER granting 37 Motion to Travel as to Erik Raul Torres (1). Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/30/17.
50
06/05/2018
Order on Sealed Motion
52
06/14/2018
Order
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.