USA v. Tueipi
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00023 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
48
06/26/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
49
07/16/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
50
07/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
51
07/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
52
07/26/2018
Leave to File Document
53
07/27/2018
Notice (Other)
07/27/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
08/10/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
57
08/15/2018
Judgment
58
08/15/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.