USA v. Turgeon
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00047 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
41
06/14/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
42
06/20/2018
Continue
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
09/14/2018
Continue
09/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
12/10/2018
Continue

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.