USA v. Twigg et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00142 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
77
05/22/2018
Continue
05/23/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
06/25/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
06/26/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
07/02/2018
Plea Agreement
85
07/02/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
07/03/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
07/02/2018
Continue
88
07/10/2018
Notice (Other)
07/10/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
07/11/2018
Psychiatric Report
07/17/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
08/24/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
98
10/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
99
10/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
100
10/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
101
10/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
10/17/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
104
10/19/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
105
10/29/2018
Forfeiture of Property
106
10/30/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
107
11/01/2018
Judgment
108
11/01/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
109
11/16/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
110
11/27/2018
Continue
11/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.