USA v. Twigg et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00142-58545 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
112
01/16/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/17/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
114
03/18/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
115
03/18/2019
Declaration
116
03/18/2019
Response in Opposition
117
03/19/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
03/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
Telephonic Notice of Appointed Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
118
03/19/2019
Continue
126
03/26/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
03/26/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
05/21/2019
Withdraw Plea of Guilty
129
05/21/2019
Declaration
05/23/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
05/21/2019
Hearing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.