USA v. Unger
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00155 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
34
06/28/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
35
07/19/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
36
07/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
37
07/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/26/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
07/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
40
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
41
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/03/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
08/10/2018
Judgment
45
08/10/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.