USA v. Unger
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00155-58703 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
34
06/28/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
35
07/19/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
36
07/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
37
07/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/26/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
07/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
40
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
41
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/03/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
08/10/2018
Judgment
45
08/10/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
46
11/19/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
47
11/20/2018
Order
12/11/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
12/12/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
53
12/12/2018
Notice (Other)
54
12/12/2018
Order of Detention
12/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
01/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
01/30/2019
Order
02/04/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
02/04/2019
Notice (Other)
63
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
03/18/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
03/28/2019
Violation Disposition Report
67
04/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
04/04/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
04/08/2019
Judgment on Revocation
70
04/08/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.