USA v. Vaifanua et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00106-60774 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
83
04/09/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
04/16/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
04/23/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
88
05/17/2019
Unopposed Motion
89
05/17/2019
Declaration
05/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.