USA v. Valenzuela
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cr-00074 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
07/31/2018
Status Report
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
09/27/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/28/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
09/28/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
44
09/28/2018
Order of Detention
45
10/01/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
46
10/02/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
47
10/04/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
48
10/05/2018
Continue
10/05/2018
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
10/05/2018
Continue
10/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
10/15/2018
Notice (Other)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
10/18/2018
Appear
10/19/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
10/23/2018
Waiver of Speedy Trial
59
11/19/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
11/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.