USA v. Valenzuela
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cr-00074-47072 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
07/31/2018
Status Report
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
09/27/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/28/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
09/28/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
44
09/28/2018
Order of Detention
45
10/01/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
46
10/02/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
47
10/04/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
48
10/05/2018
Continue
10/05/2018
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
10/05/2018
Continue
10/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
10/15/2018
Notice (Other)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
10/18/2018
Appear
10/19/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
10/23/2018
Waiver of Speedy Trial
59
11/19/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
11/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
01/08/2019
Order
63
01/09/2019
Status Report
65
01/14/2019
Plea Agreement
66
01/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/17/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
01/23/2019
Memorandum
71
02/04/2019
Notice (Other)
02/05/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
02/04/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
74
03/12/2019
Order
75
03/19/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
76
04/02/2019
Continue
77
04/02/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
78
04/02/2019
Declaration
04/03/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/03/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
04/15/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
82
04/15/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
83
04/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
84
04/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
85
04/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
86
04/19/2019
DEPS Notice
87
04/22/2019
Additional Related Document
88
04/22/2019
Supplement
89
04/22/2019
Notice (Other)
90
04/23/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
91
04/29/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
92
04/29/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
93
04/29/2019
Declaration
94
04/29/2019
~Util - Plea Entered
96
04/30/2019
Judgment
97
04/30/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
98
04/30/2019
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
99
05/03/2019
USCA Case Number
100
05/03/2019
USCA Time Schedule Order
101
05/06/2019
Notice (Other)
05/17/2019
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.