USA v. Vega-Hernandez et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cr-00023-41209 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
305
04/24/2019
Order of Detention
04/24/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
307
05/06/2019
Unopposed Motion
308
05/06/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion
309
05/08/2019
Violation Disposition Report
05/15/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
311
05/16/2019
Judgment on Revocation
312
05/16/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.