USA v. Vehlewald
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cr-00053 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
163
10/29/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
164
10/29/2018
Order of Detention
10/29/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
165
10/29/2018
Unopposed Motion
166
10/31/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
11/05/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
168
11/15/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
169
12/03/2018
Violation Disposition Report
12/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
172
12/17/2018
Judgment on Revocation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.