USA v. Vickers
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00003 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
169
06/18/2018
Notice (Other)
06/20/2018
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
170
06/21/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
171
06/21/2018
Certificate of Appealability
172
06/25/2018
USCA Case Number
173
07/09/2018
Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.