USA v. Villanueva
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00045 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
51
05/28/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
06/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
06/01/2018
Plea Agreement
54
06/01/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
55
06/05/2018
Errata
06/06/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
06/27/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
08/09/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
61
08/30/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
66
09/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
67
09/12/2018
Notice (Other)
09/13/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
09/18/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
71
09/20/2018
Judgment
72
09/20/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.