USA v. Walker
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00061-50762 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
53
01/07/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
54
01/07/2019
Notice (Other)
55
01/07/2019
Order of Detention
01/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
01/11/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
57
01/29/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/30/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
02/01/2019
Subsequent Petition for Offender - 12C - Sealed pdf
60
02/04/2019
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
02/05/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
02/05/2019
Notice (Other)
63
02/06/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
64
02/07/2019
Dismiss
65
02/07/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss
02/07/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
02/07/2019
Order of Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.