USA v. Walls
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00076-60436 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/17/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
07/17/2018
Indictment - For Public
07/18/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/18/2018
Pretrial Services Report
07/19/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
07/19/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
8
07/19/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
9
07/19/2018
Order of Detention
10
08/02/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/31/2018
Protective Order
16
11/01/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
17
11/29/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/19/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
02/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
02/28/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/28/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
29
03/22/2019
Plea Agreement
30
03/22/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
03/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
04/08/2019
Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.