USA v. Washington
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2008-cr-00121-9989 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
168
12/11/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
12/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
171
12/14/2018
Order
172
04/04/2019
Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release
173
04/22/2019
Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.