USA v. Washington
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00104 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
72
08/31/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)
73
09/03/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
74
09/11/2018
Order
09/13/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
09/14/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
77
09/24/2018
USCA Case Number
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.