USA v. Watson
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00122 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
34
05/21/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
35
06/01/2018
Continue
06/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
07/02/2018
Continue
07/03/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
08/27/2018
Continue
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.