USA v. Webb
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00053-55447 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
65
08/23/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
66
08/27/2018
Order
67
11/01/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
68
11/02/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
11/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
11/20/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
72
11/20/2018
Notice (Other)
73
11/20/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
74
12/19/2018
Summons Returned Executed
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
01/07/2019
Subsequent Summons for Offender - 12C
77
01/07/2019
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
01/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
01/08/2019
Notice (Other)
81
01/08/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
82
01/15/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.