USA v. Webb
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00135 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
69
05/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
70
05/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
71
05/25/2018
Continue
72
05/25/2018
Affidavit
05/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
05/25/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
75
05/29/2018
Errata
05/29/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
07/10/2018
Appear
07/11/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
07/13/2018
Notice (Other)
82
07/16/2018
Response in Opposition
07/16/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.