USA v. Weightman
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00046-48998 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
12/11/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
39
12/11/2018
Order of Detention
12/11/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
12/17/2018
Order of Detention
43
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
01/10/2019
Unopposed Motion
47
01/15/2019
Hearing
01/17/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
01/22/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
53
01/22/2019
Order of Release
54
01/22/2019
Order of Release
01/29/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
02/15/2019
Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - WOA
57
02/15/2019
Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - WOA
02/15/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
02/20/2019
Subsequent Summons for Offender - 12C
60
02/21/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
02/21/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/21/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
02/21/2019
Order of Detention
63
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.