USA v. Weis
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00075-57699 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
47
07/27/2018
Application for Writ of Execution on Permanent Fund Dividend
48
07/27/2018
Errata
07/30/2018
Writ Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
07/27/2018
Application for Writ of Execution on Permanent Fund Dividend
50
08/31/2018
PFD Writ Returned
51
11/06/2018
PFD Writ Returned
52
02/15/2019
Release of Funds
53
02/26/2019
Order on Motion for Release of Funds
54
04/24/2019
Vacate (2255)
55
04/24/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
56
05/22/2019
Order
57
05/23/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.