USA v. Welch
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00060 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
05/23/2018
Violation Disposition Report
116
05/29/2018
Notice (Other)
05/31/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
118
06/12/2018
Judgment on Revocation
119
06/12/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.