USA v. Welker et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2015-cr-00006-54300 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
65
11/26/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
11/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
11/26/2018
Appear
71
12/21/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
73
01/11/2019
Appear
74
01/14/2019
Appear
01/15/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
01/22/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.