USA v. Welker et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00002 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
61
06/08/2018
Modify Conditions of Release
62
06/18/2018
Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
07/02/2018
Plea Agreement
65
07/02/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
07/06/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
07/18/2018
Errata
07/20/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
07/20/2018
Forfeiture of Property
72
08/17/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
73
08/31/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
75
09/19/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
76
09/25/2018
Continue
77
09/26/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
10/03/2018
Modify Conditions of Release
80
10/03/2018
Unopposed Motion
81
10/04/2018
Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
10/04/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
10/26/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
84
10/26/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
10/31/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
10/31/2018
Continue
87
10/31/2018
Affidavit
11/01/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
11/09/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/14/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.