USA v. Welker et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00002-59070 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
98
01/17/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/23/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
102
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
113
04/03/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
114
04/16/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
115
04/16/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
116
04/17/2019
Unopposed Motion
04/17/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
118
04/17/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
119
04/17/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
120
04/22/2019
Notice (Other)
121
04/23/2019
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
04/29/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
124
04/30/2019
Judgment
125
04/30/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
126
05/07/2019
Forfeiture of Property
127
05/07/2019
Affidavit

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.