USA v. Wells
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00008 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
841
06/20/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
06/20/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Attorney Appointment Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
844
07/16/2018
Protective Order
845
07/16/2018
Protective Order
846
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
847
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
848
07/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
849
07/19/2018
Notice (Other)
07/20/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
851
07/20/2018
Notice (Other)
852
07/23/2018
Notice (Other)
853
07/31/2018
Status Report
854
08/08/2018
Status Report
855
08/16/2018
Notice (Other)
08/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
857
08/20/2018
Appear
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
859
08/23/2018
Notice (Other)
860
08/23/2018
Continue
861
08/23/2018
Response in Opposition
862
08/23/2018
Declaration
863
08/23/2018
Declaration
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
865
08/24/2018
Continue
08/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
870
09/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
872
09/20/2018
Status Report
874
09/21/2018
Status Report
09/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
879
09/24/2018
Notice (Other)
880
09/25/2018
Notice (Other)
881
09/26/2018
Order
882
10/17/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
883
10/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
885
10/31/2018
Status Report
886
11/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
887
11/02/2018
Response in Opposition
888
11/02/2018
Status Report
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
890
11/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
892
11/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/06/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
894
11/06/2018
Notice (Other)
11/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
896
11/12/2018
Discovery
898
11/14/2018
Joinder to Motion
900
11/28/2018
Notice (Other)
901
12/07/2018
Discovery
903
12/11/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
904
12/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
905
12/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
908
12/15/2018
Response in Opposition

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.