USA v. Wells
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00008-48733 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
841
06/20/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
06/20/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Attorney Appointment Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
844
07/16/2018
Protective Order
845
07/16/2018
Protective Order
846
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
847
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
848
07/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
849
07/19/2018
Notice (Other)
07/20/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
851
07/20/2018
Notice (Other)
852
07/23/2018
Notice (Other)
853
07/31/2018
Status Report
854
08/08/2018
Status Report
855
08/16/2018
Notice (Other)
08/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
857
08/20/2018
Appear
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
859
08/23/2018
Notice (Other)
860
08/23/2018
Continue
861
08/23/2018
Response in Opposition
862
08/23/2018
Declaration
863
08/23/2018
Declaration
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
865
08/24/2018
Continue
08/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
870
09/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
872
09/20/2018
Status Report
874
09/21/2018
Status Report
09/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
879
09/24/2018
Notice (Other)
880
09/25/2018
Notice (Other)
881
09/26/2018
Order
882
10/17/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
883
10/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
885
10/31/2018
Status Report
886
11/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
887
11/02/2018
Response in Opposition
888
11/02/2018
Status Report
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
890
11/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
892
11/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/06/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
894
11/06/2018
Notice (Other)
11/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
896
11/12/2018
Discovery
898
11/14/2018
Joinder to Motion
900
11/28/2018
Notice (Other)
901
12/07/2018
Discovery
903
12/11/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
904
12/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
905
12/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
908
12/15/2018
Response in Opposition
909
12/17/2018
Notice (Other)
910
12/18/2018
Notice (Other)
911
12/19/2018
Notice (Other)
912
12/19/2018
Supplement
913
12/21/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
914
12/21/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
915
12/21/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
916
01/04/2019
Hearing
01/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
918
01/07/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/08/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
920
01/08/2019
Notice (Other)
921
01/08/2019
Notice (Other)
01/08/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
922
01/08/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
923
01/08/2019
Appear
925
01/10/2019
Status Conference
926
01/16/2019
Unopposed Motion
927
01/17/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
01/17/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
928
01/17/2019
Leave to File Document
932
01/18/2019
Response in Opposition
933
01/22/2019
Third Party Custodian Report
01/22/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
934
01/22/2019
Appear
936
01/22/2019
Motion Hearing
937
01/23/2019
Motion Hearing
938
01/23/2019
Witness List Public Doc
939
01/23/2019
Notice (Other)
940
01/24/2019
Order
941
01/30/2019
Notice of Change of Address
942
03/04/2019
Notice of Change of Address

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.