USA v. Wells
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00123 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
07/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
63
07/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
64
07/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
65
07/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
66
07/09/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
07/09/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
07/10/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
07/10/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
07/18/2018
Judgment
72
07/18/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
08/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
08/21/2018
Status Report
75
08/22/2018
Status Report
08/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
09/24/2018
Notice (Other)
78
09/28/2018
Status Report
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
10/15/2018
Status Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.